HI SR39 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources, In Consultation With The Department Of The Attorney General And The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs, To Evaluate The Feasibility Of Establishing Laws To Require Written Permission From The Landowner In Order To Hunt On Private Lands And To Discuss Potential Amendments To Criminal Trespassing Laws To Address Hunting Situations.
Title
Hunting; Trespass on Private Lands; Written Permission; Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3453) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-11 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-12-12 11:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 04-11-12 10:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3112), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fukunaga, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-12 1:25PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to WLH, JDL. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) Offered. |