HI SR37 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The County Of Maui To Approve The Installation And Use Of Composting Toilets, Especially In Remote Areas Where County Sewer Line Access And Cesspool Conversion Can Be Cost-prohibitive.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The County Of Maui To Approve The Installation And Use Of Composting Toilets, Especially In Remote Areas Where County Sewer Line Access And Cesspool Conversion Can Be Cost-prohibitive.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1544), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 2:25PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-08SenateReferred to AEN, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback