HI SR37 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Establishment Of An Earned Time Program.
Title
Public Safety; Earned Time Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) One Day Notice 04-15-11. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1271) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-11 2:55PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) Referred to PGM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Offered. |