HI SR36 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SR36

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Education To Increase Access To Trauma-informed Care For Public School Students Who Experience Sexual Violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Education To Increase Access To Trauma-informed Care For Public School Students Who Experience Sexual Violence.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to EDU, JDC.
2020-03-03SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SR36 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback