HI SR35 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SR35

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting That The City And County Of Honolulu Prohibit Electric Scooters, Electric Bicycles, And Electric Trikes On Sidewalks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting That The City And County Of Honolulu Prohibit Electric Scooters, Electric Bicycles, And Electric Trikes On Sidewalks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-05-21SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3620), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDC.
2020-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to TRS, JDC.
2020-03-03SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SR35 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback