HI SR34 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR34
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Federal Funding To Provide School Resource Officers In Every Intermediate And High School In Hawaii That Requests It.
Title
Requesting Federal Funding To Provide School Resource Officers In Every Intermediate And High School In Hawaii That Requests It.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from PSM/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3294), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, L. Thielen. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 03-27-18 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-22-18 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 2:46PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EDU, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR34 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.