HI SR28 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SR28

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Recommitted to EET/WTL.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Hawaii Community Development Authority To Update And Report On Transit-oriented Development Planning And Implementation For The Kakaako Community Development District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Hawaii Community Development Authority To Update And Report On Transit-oriented Development Planning And Implementation For The Kakaako Community Development District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08SenateRecommitted to EET/WTL.
2020-07-06SenateOne Day Notice 07-08-20.
2020-07-06SenateReported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3793) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2020-06-29SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-29SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-26SenateThe committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 06-29-20 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to EET/WTL.
2020-02-27SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SR28 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback