HI SR27 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR27
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Management Audit Of The Hawaii Tourism Authority.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Management Audit Of The Hawaii Tourism Authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1212), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 2:30PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR27 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
HR130 (Same As) 2017-03-21 - The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR130 (Same As) 2017-03-21 - The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=27&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SR27_.HTM |