HI SR26 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR26
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Survey And Report On Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Instruction Being Offered Throughout State Departments.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Survey And Report On Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Instruction Being Offered Throughout State Departments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1394) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to HTH. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR26 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR37 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
SCR37 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32