HI SR26 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR26
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Restaurants To Donate Any Leftover Food To Homeless Shelters At The End Of Their Business Day And Urging The Department Of Health To Develop And Disseminate Temperature Controlled For Safety Food Donation Guidelines.
Title
Urging Restaurants To Donate Any Leftover Food To Homeless Shelters At The End Of Their Business Day And Urging The Department Of Health To Develop And Disseminate Temperature Controlled For Safety Food Donation Guidelines.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1752) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 10:35AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR26 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).