HI SR22 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR22
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Establish Programs And Educational Opportunities To Increase Media Literacy And Promote Digital Citizenship.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Establish Programs And Educational Opportunities To Increase Media Literacy And Promote Digital Citizenship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-22. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3541) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kanuha. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR22 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HR48 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR28 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HR48 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR28 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.