HI SR200 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR200
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Human Resources Development To Establish A New Civil Service Class For Project Managers Under Collective Bargaining Unit 13.
Title
Urging The Department Of Human Resources Development To Establish A New Civil Service Class For Project Managers Under Collective Bargaining Unit 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1383) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:05PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to LCA. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR200 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR240 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SCR240 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).