HI SR197 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR197
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Planning And Permitting Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Publish On Its Website All Decisions Regarding Waivers And Variances.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Planning And Permitting Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Publish On Its Website All Decisions Regarding Waivers And Variances.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3673) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR197 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to AEN.
SCR204 (Same As) 2022-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
SCR204 (Same As) 2022-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Subjects
Building Code
City and County of Honolulu
Construction
Department of Planning and Permitting
Land Use
Variance
Waiver
City and County of Honolulu
Construction
Department of Planning and Permitting
Land Use
Variance
Waiver