HI SR186 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services And Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Work With The City And County Of Honolulu To Establish Community Gardens On Underutilized Public Land.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services And Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Work With The City And County Of Honolulu To Establish Community Gardens On Underutilized Public Land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from GVO/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3632) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 1:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to GVO/WTL. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR210 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to WAL/LGO, referral sheet 28