HI SR178 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Office Of Primary Care And Rural Health To Facilitate Discussions With Key Community Health And Social Service Organizations Within Hawaii County To Address The Health And Wellness Needs Of The Most Vulnerable By Aligning The Goals And Objectives Of Key Organizations Into One Shared 2030 Health Vision Plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Office Of Primary Care And Rural Health To Facilitate Discussions With Key Community Health And Social Service Organizations Within Hawaii County To Address The Health And Wellness Needs Of The Most Vulnerable By Aligning The Goals And Objectives Of Key Organizations Into One Shared 2030 Health Vision Plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2020-03-10SenateReferred to CPH.
2020-03-06SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback