HI SR174 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SR174

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Governor To Establish Advance Travel Quarantine And Statewide Stay-at-home Orders To Ensure Rapid And Effective Response To Any Resurgence Of The Coronavirus Disease 2019 In Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Governor To Establish Advance Travel Quarantine And Statewide Stay-at-home Orders To Ensure Rapid And Effective Response To Any Resurgence Of The Coronavirus Disease 2019 In Hawaii.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
2020-05-19SenateOne Day Notice 05-21-20.
2020-05-19SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3613) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2020-05-19SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2020-05-18SenateThe committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 05-19-20 2:00PM in conference room 229.
2020-05-15SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 05-18-20 4:05PM in conference room 229.
2020-03-10SenateReferred to EDU.
2020-03-06SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SR174 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback