HI SR170 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Finalization Of Memorandums Of Understanding And Other Actions For Purposes Of Diversifying Sources Of Irrigation In Central Oahu.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Finalization Of Memorandums Of Understanding And Other Actions For Purposes Of Diversifying Sources Of Irrigation In Central Oahu.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from HWN/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1744) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Fevella.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on HWN/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 1:17PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to HWN/AEN.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback