HI SR17 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR17
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The National Football League To Allow Injured Players To Use Cannabidiol In Pill Or Liquid Form, In Lieu Of Opioids, To Address The Pain From Their Work-related Injuries.
Title
Urging The National Football League To Allow Injured Players To Use Cannabidiol In Pill Or Liquid Form, In Lieu Of Opioids, To Address The Pain From Their Work-related Injuries.
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to CPH. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from LBR/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3289), with recommendation of referral to CPH. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR/ETT added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-18 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to LBR/ETT, CPH. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR17 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to JDL.
HR40 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HR40 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=17&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR17_.HTM |