HI SR17 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Form A Working Group To Expeditiously Resolve The Issue Of Roads In Limbo In Maui County.
Title
Roads In Limbo; Maui Working Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-04-02 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-30 | (S) One Day Notice 04-02-12. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from TIA/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3079) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Dela Cruz, Kahele, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-12 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Referred to TIA/PGM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Offered. |