HI SR161 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Human Services To Create A Compact Of Free Association Advisory Body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Human Services To Create A Compact Of Free Association Advisory Body.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1788) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1369), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:50PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to HMS, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback