HI SR152 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SR152

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Re-Referred to GVO.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directing The Executive Branch Departments Of The State Of Hawaii To Participate In The Department Of Human Resources Development's Modernization "pathway Programs" To Recruit And Hire Employees To Fill The State's Vacancies With The Best And Brightest Candidates To Serve The Residents Of Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing The Executive Branch Departments Of The State Of Hawaii To Participate In The Department Of Human Resources Development's Modernization "pathway Programs" To Recruit And Hire Employees To Fill The State's Vacancies With The Best And Brightest Candidates To Serve The Residents Of Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateRe-Referred to GVO.
2020-03-10SenateReferred to GVO/HMS.
2020-03-06SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SR152 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback