HI SR150 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Education To Adopt The Use Of Electronic Transcripts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Education To Adopt The Use Of Electronic Transcripts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-03-29SenateOne Day Notice 04-01-19.
2019-03-29SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1665) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to EDU.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback