HI SR148 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR148
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to HTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to HTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation To Create A Plan For The Kau Hospital To Incorporate Modern Computed Tomography Equipment By July 1, 2024.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation To Create A Plan For The Kau Hospital To Incorporate Modern Computed Tomography Equipment By July 1, 2024.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HTH. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR148 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR155 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to HTH.
SCR155 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to HTH.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=148&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SR148_.HTM |