HI SR146 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR146
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, In Coordination And Cooperation With The Executive Office On Aging And County Of Hawaii Office Of Aging, To Conduct A Study On The Necessity And Feasibility Of Establishing A Senior Living Center In The Kau District.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, In Coordination And Cooperation With The Executive Office On Aging And County Of Hawaii Office Of Aging, To Conduct A Study On The Necessity And Feasibility Of Establishing A Senior Living Center In The Kau District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HMS/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3634) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HMS/EET. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR146 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to HTH, JDC.
SCR153 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
SCR153 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
Subjects
County of Hawaii
County of Hawaii Office of Aging
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Executive Office on Aging
Ka‘u Senior Living Center
County of Hawaii Office of Aging
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Executive Office on Aging
Ka‘u Senior Living Center