HI SR144 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Probate Court To Increase Transparency Regarding The Kamehameha Schools Trustee Selection Process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Probate Court To Increase Transparency Regarding The Kamehameha Schools Trustee Selection Process.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to JDC.
2019-03-27SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1562), with recommendation of referral to JDC.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:18PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to HWN, JDC.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR123 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback