HI SR142 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR142
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State To Convene An Artificial Intelligence Advisory Committee To Investigate How To Implement, Develop, And Regulate Artificial Intelligence In The State.
Title
Requesting The State To Convene An Artificial Intelligence Advisory Committee To Investigate How To Implement, Develop, And Regulate Artificial Intelligence In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from TEC/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1683) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Wakai. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to TEC/CPH. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR142 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
HR119 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 33
HR119 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=142&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR142_.HTM |