HI SR141 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR141
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Study On The Significance Of Traditional Hawaiian Practices, Including The Makahiki, And Their Effect On The Perpetuation Of Native Hawaiian Culture.
Title
Requesting A Study On The Significance Of Traditional Hawaiian Practices, Including The Makahiki, And Their Effect On The Perpetuation Of Native Hawaiian Culture.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-02-19. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1671) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:18PM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to HWN. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR141 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
HR122 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
HR122 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=141&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR141_.HTM |