HI SR140 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Establish A Task Force To Conduct A Study Concerning The Current And Future Needs Of The State Archives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Establish A Task Force To Conduct A Study Concerning The Current And Future Needs Of The State Archives.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-02SenateOne Day Notice 04-03-19.
2019-04-02SenateReported from GVO/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1704) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 2:30PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to GVO/LCA.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR162 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback