HI SR14 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Rename A Section Of Kapule Highway In The County Of Kauai As The Kauai Veterans Memorial Highway.
Title
Kauai Veterans Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-16. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3311) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-24-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Reported from PSM/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2881), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Gabbard, Chun Oakland, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Slom. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRE, WAM. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=14&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SR14_.HTM |