HI SR137 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Study The Feasibility Of A State Lottery To Fund Hawaii's Public Education.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Study The Feasibility Of A State Lottery To Fund Hawaii's Public Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from ETT/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3241), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Dela Cruz. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-18 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to ETT/EDU, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=137&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR137_.HTM |