HI SR136 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR136
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to GVO/WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to GVO/WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging All State Departments And Agencies To Cooperate And Assist Kahoolawe Island Reserve Commission With Technical, Engineering, Or Logistical Support In Helping The Island Of Kahoolawe To Recover From The Devastating Fire That Began On February 22, 2020.
Title
Encouraging All State Departments And Agencies To Cooperate And Assist Kahoolawe Island Reserve Commission With Technical, Engineering, Or Logistical Support In Helping The Island Of Kahoolawe To Recover From The Devastating Fire That Began On February 22, 2020.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to GVO/WTL, WAM. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR136 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=136&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SR136_.HTM |