HI SR135 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That Participants In Public Demonstrations Other Than Permitted Events Such As Marathons And Parades Follow Traffic Laws.
Title
Requesting That Participants In Public Demonstrations Other Than Permitted Events Such As Marathons And Parades Follow Traffic Laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3394) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC/TRE. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |