HI SR134 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Hawaii To Follow And Abide By The Public Notice Requirements For Its Meetings Pursuant To Chapter 92, Hawaii Revised Statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Hawaii To Follow And Abide By The Public Notice Requirements For Its Meetings Pursuant To Chapter 92, Hawaii Revised Statutes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-18SenateOne Day Notice 04-22-19.
2019-04-18SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2194) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-15SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, K. Kahele, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
2019-04-12SenateRe-Referred to HRE.
2019-04-11SenateThe committee(s) on HRE added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 04-15-19 2:00PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to HRE, JDC/WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR148 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback