HI SR134 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR134
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Hawaii To Follow And Abide By The Public Notice Requirements For Its Meetings Pursuant To Chapter 92, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Urging The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Hawaii To Follow And Abide By The Public Notice Requirements For Its Meetings Pursuant To Chapter 92, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-19. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2194) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, K. Kahele, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 04-15-19 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to HRE, JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR134 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
HR148 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
HR148 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33