HI SR131 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Office Of Planning To Establish An Agricultural Housing Task Force To Study Existing County And State Laws, Rules, And Processes To Plan For The Construction Of On-farm Employee Housing Within The State Agricultural District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Office Of Planning To Establish An Agricultural Housing Task Force To Study Existing County And State Laws, Rules, And Processes To Plan For The Construction Of On-farm Employee Housing Within The State Agricultural District.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-02SenateOne Day Notice 04-03-19.
2019-04-02SenateReported from EET/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1709) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EET/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to EET/AEN.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback