HI SR130 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR130
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Congress To Consent To The Enactment Of Act 80, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2017.
Title
Requesting The United States Congress To Consent To The Enactment Of Act 80, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HWN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1451) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 10:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN/JDC. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR130 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR165 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR165 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.