HI SR130 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SR130

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Hawaiian Homes Commission To Improve Access To Hawaiian Home Lands And Other Trust Assets To Its Native Hawaiian Beneficiaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Hawaiian Homes Commission To Improve Access To Hawaiian Home Lands And Other Trust Assets To Its Native Hawaiian Beneficiaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
2020-07-08SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3825) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2020-06-30SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-25SenateThe committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 06-30-20 12:31PM in conference room 016.
2020-06-22SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 06-25-20 12:32PM in conference room 016.
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 2:15PM in conference room 016.
2020-03-10SenateReferred to HWN.
2020-03-06SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SR130 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback