HI SR129 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Statewide Support For Traffic Safety Legislation To Reduce Motor Vehicle Fatalities And Injuries.
Title
Urging Statewide Support For Traffic Safety Legislation To Reduce Motor Vehicle Fatalities And Injuries.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-18. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Reported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3362) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR142 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).