HI SR126 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR126
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Government Of Hawaii To Establish A Safe Routes To School Advisory Group To Develop A Comprehensive Statewide Safe Routes To School Strategic Plan.
Title
Urging The Government Of Hawaii To Establish A Safe Routes To School Advisory Group To Develop A Comprehensive Statewide Safe Routes To School Strategic Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3774) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, DeCoite, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:20PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to TRS. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR126 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR142 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Referred to TRN, EDN, referral sheet 47
SCR142 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Referred to TRN, EDN, referral sheet 47