HI SR126 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Re-Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Education To Provide Each Of Its Schools With Two Flagpoles So That The United States Flag And Hawaii State Flag May Be Flown At The Same Height.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Education To Provide Each Of Its Schools With Two Flagpoles So That The United States Flag And Hawaii State Flag May Be Flown At The Same Height.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateRe-Referred to WAM.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR155 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback