HI SR124 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SR124

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands, Department Of Transportation Highways Division, And Hawaii County To Collectively Develop A Plan To Improve Mealani Road And Establish A Protocol To Use Mealani Road As An Emergency Bypass Route When Mamalahoa Highway Is Inaccessible.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands, Department Of Transportation Highways Division, And Hawaii County To Collectively Develop A Plan To Improve Mealani Road And Establish A Protocol To Use Mealani Road As An Emergency Bypass Route When Mamalahoa Highway Is Inaccessible.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
2020-06-30SenateOne Day Notice 07-01-20.
2020-06-30SenateReported from HWN/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3728) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2020-06-25SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2020-06-25SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
2020-06-22SenateThe committee(s) on HWN/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 06-25-20 12:31PM in conference room 016.
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on HWN/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 2:10PM in conference room 016.
2020-03-10SenateReferred to HWN/TRS.
2020-03-06SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SR124 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback