HI SR122 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The State Auditor To Conduct A Performance And Financial Audit Of The Hawaii Green Infrastructure Authority, Including The Hawaii Green Energy Market Securitization Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The State Auditor To Conduct A Performance And Financial Audit Of The Hawaii Green Infrastructure Authority, Including The Hawaii Green Energy Market Securitization Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateThe committee on EET deferred the measure.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee on GVO deferred the measure.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to GVO/EET.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback