HI SR121 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Establish A Working Group To Develop A Conservation Action Plan To Explore And Identify Conservation Alternatives For The Undeveloped Portions Of The Turtle Bay Hotel And Resort Property And Surrounding Lands With Conservation Or Historic Value.
Title
Turtle Bay; Land Conservation; Working Group
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-13. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WTL/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1418) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-13 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/JDL. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDL. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=121&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR121_.HTM |