HI SR120 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR120
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Auditor To Perform An Audit Of The Department Of Education's Office Of Curriculum And Instructional Design.
Title
Requesting The State Auditor To Perform An Audit Of The Department Of Education's Office Of Curriculum And Instructional Design.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from GVO/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1353) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-21 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to GVO/EDU. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR120 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR155 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32
SCR155 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32