HI SR119 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Study And Make Recommendations On How To Increase Compliance With The Various Requirements For Agricultural Lands And To Prevent Abuse Of Agricultural Land Leases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Study And Make Recommendations On How To Increase Compliance With The Various Requirements For Agricultural Lands And To Prevent Abuse Of Agricultural Land Leases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-03-29SenateOne Day Notice 04-01-19.
2019-03-29SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1660) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 2:25PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to AEN.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR65 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback