HI SR118 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The University Of Hawaii Administration To Establish And Implement A Tobacco-free University Policy For All University Campuses And Facilities.
Title
Tobacco Free UH
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from HRE/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1545) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Tokuda, Slom. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-11-13 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to HRE/HTH. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=118&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR118_.HTM |