HI SR114 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encouraging The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation To Reevaluate The Rental Assistance Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation To Reevaluate The Rental Assistance Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1830) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on HOU deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to HOU.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback