HI SR11 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting Members Of The United States Congress To Amend Federal Law To Ensure That Victims Of Sexual Harassment And Sexual Assault Who Might Otherwise Be Forced Into Arbitration And Silence Instead Have Access To The Courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting Members Of The United States Congress To Amend Federal Law To Ensure That Victims Of Sexual Harassment And Sexual Assault Who Might Otherwise Be Forced Into Arbitration And Silence Instead Have Access To The Courts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1828) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to JDC/WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1554), with recommendation of referral to JDC/WAM.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
2019-01-22SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR6 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback