HI SR101 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SR101

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing And Supporting Ongoing Collaborative Efforts Between The Department Of Health, Hep Free Hawaii, And Others To Produce A Statewide Plan To Eliminate Viral Hepatitis In Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing And Supporting Ongoing Collaborative Efforts Between The Department Of Health, Hep Free Hawaii, And Others To Produce A Statewide Plan To Eliminate Viral Hepatitis In Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2020-03-10SenateReferred to CPH.
2020-03-06SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SR101 (Carry Over) 2019-03-12 - Referred to GVO/PSM, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback