HI SCR99 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Okimoto.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene An Interdepartmental Working Group To Address The Lack Of Consolidated, Consistent Health Screening Programs In Public Schools For Children In The State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene An Interdepartmental Working Group To Address The Lack Of Consolidated, Consistent Health Screening Programs In Public Schools For Children In The State.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Okimoto.
2019-04-11HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say.
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-11-19 11:30AM in conference room 329.
2019-04-10HouseThe committee(s) on HLT/LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-11-19 at 11:30AM.
2019-04-08HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/LHE on Wednesday, 04-10-19 2:00PM in conference room 309.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to HLT/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 611) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from CPH/HMS/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1750) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/HMS/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 10:45AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-14SenateRe-Referred to CPH/HMS/EDU.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to CPH/HMS/EDU, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR114 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HLT/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback